Global patent index - EP 1074955 A2

EP 1074955 A2 2001-02-07 - Data transfer devices and methods

Title (en)

Data transfer devices and methods

Title (de)

Datenübertragungsvorrichtungen und -verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositifs et méthodes pour le transfert de données

Publication

EP 1074955 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306668 A

Priority

GB 9918427 A

Abstract (en)

In one aspect, the present invention provides a network of game machines (506, 508, 510, 514) including a central controller (500). The central controller is useable to receive data from the game machines and also to transmit data to the game machines, for example to upload new or corrected software to the game machines. Some of the game machines may be connected to the network via radio link (512). Higher baud rates, such as 10,000 baud, are acheivable with the network of the present invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3223 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/323 (2013.01); G07F 17/3281 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074955 A2 20010207; EP 1074955 A3 20030813; GB 0019277 D0 20000927; GB 2356279 A 20010516; GB 2356279 B 20040428; GB 9918427 D0 19991006

INPADOC legal status

2009-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080910

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080228

2007-02-21 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSE

- Effective date: 20050909

2007-02-21 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSE

- Effective date: 20061208

2007-01-24 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSE

- Effective date: 20061208

2006-01-25 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSE

- Effective date: 20050909

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REVOLUTION ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEMS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-05-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REVOLUTION ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEMS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-10 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI