Global Patent Index - EP 1074962 A2

EP 1074962 A2 2001-02-07 - Label

Title (en)

Label

Title (de)

Etikett

Title (fr)

Etiquette

Publication

EP 1074962 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116491 A

Priority

DE 29913746 U

Abstract (en)

The printed surface (26) of the label (10) is a plane surface.

Abstract (de)

Etikett zur Kennzeichnung von Gegenständen, das insbesondere durch Stanzung erzeugte Sollreißstellen (22) aufweist, die ein unversehrtes Abziehen des Etiketts (10) von einem mit dem Etikett (10) gekennzeichneten Gegenstand verhindern, wobei eine bedruckbare Oberfläche (26) des Etiketts (10) eben ausgebildet ist und wobei die Sollreißstellen (22) für einen Betrachter des aufgebrachten Etiketts (10) nicht sichtbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913746 U1 19991118; EP 1074962 A2 20010207; EP 1074962 A3 20010822; EP 1074962 B1 20040128

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHREINER GROUP GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WOELFLE, DIETER, 71139 EHNINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50005121

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005121

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20140203

2014-02-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005121

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005121 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020119

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 3/10 A, 7G 09F 3/02 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI