Global Patent Index - EP 1074970 A2

EP 1074970 A2 2001-02-07 - Digital feed-forward active noise control system

Title (en)

Digital feed-forward active noise control system

Title (de)

Digitales vorwärtsgeregeltes System für aktive Lärmkontrolle

Title (fr)

Système de contrôle actif du bruit à correction aval

Publication

EP 1074970 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122367 A

Priority

  • EP 96920661 A
  • US 83495 P

Abstract (en)

A method of noise control of an acoustic signal comprising: obtaining a reference signal (X) of the acoustic signal to be controlled, applying an antinoise signal to the acoustic signal so as to control the acoustic signal, obtaining an error signal (E) resulting from the application of the antinoise signal (U) to the acoustic signal, generating the antinoise signal from the reference signal by passing the noise signal through a first filter (33) having controllable filter coefficients, using a simplified model (31) of a signal path from a location (19) of the antinoise signal to a location (21) of the error signal to obtain modified representations of the noise signal, controlling the filter coefficients by processing the error signal and the modified representation of the noise signal and generating a coefficient control signal (35) such as to generate the antinoise signal, and applying the coefficient control signal to the first filter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/168

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/178 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/1784 (2013.01); G10K 2210/1081 (2013.01); G10K 2210/3027 (2013.01); G10K 2210/3053 (2013.01); G10K 2210/3213 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074971 A2 20010207; EP 1074971 A3 20010509; EP 1074971 B1 20030409; EP 1074970 A2 20010207; EP 1074970 A3 20010509; EP 1074970 B1 20030423

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080702

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69627725 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0836736 P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10K 11/168 A, 7G 10K 11/178 B

2001-02-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 836736

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB