Global Patent Index - EP 1075001 A2

EP 1075001 A2 2001-02-07 - Network adapter and method of making same

Title (en)

Network adapter and method of making same

Title (de)

Netzadapter sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Adaptateur de réseau et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1075001 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810634 A

Priority

CH 137699 A

Abstract (en)

The mains adapter has a transformer (1) with an iron core (2) and a primary winding and a secondary winding and a plastic cover (7) made in one piece that fully and closely encloses the transformer with the exception of the contact elements and connections (8a) that may be fed out through the cover. An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a mains adapter.

Abstract (de)

Der Eisenkern (2) und die Wicklungen (3, 4) eines Transformators (1) werden von einem Spulenkörper (21) zusammengehalten, welcher derart in einer Spritzgussform angeordnet wird, dass er lediglich mit kleinen Teilen seiner Oberfläche mit derselben in Kontakt kommt, während der Transformator (1) von ihren Wänden beabstandet ist. Anschliessend wird zur Vervollständigung einer kleinen und leichten, den Transformator allseitig und anliegend umschliessenden einstückigen Hülle (7) aus Kunststoff eine Schale (22) angespritzt. Fugen zwischen dem Spulenkörper (21) und der Schale (22) liegen im wesentlichen auf dem Grund von Vertiefungen, welche Kühlrippen (20) trennen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/02; H01F 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 7/04 (2006.01); H01F 27/02 (2006.01); H01F 41/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/005 (2013.01); H01F 27/022 (2013.01); H01F 27/025 (2013.01); H01F 27/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075001 A2 20010207; EP 1075001 A3 20020320; CN 1283859 A 20010214; JP 2001069760 A 20010316; US 6271742 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI