Global Patent Index - EP 1075003 A2

EP 1075003 A2 2001-02-07 - Annular body for receiving windings for coils and transformers

Title (en)

Annular body for receiving windings for coils and transformers

Title (de)

Ringkörper zur Aufnahme von Wicklungen für Spulen oder Transformatoren

Title (fr)

Corps annulaire pour le logement d'enroulements de bobines et de transformateurs

Publication

EP 1075003 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116633 A

Priority

DE 29913484 U

Abstract (en)

The coil body (1) for accommodating at least one winding with connection pins (2) arranged firmly at the coil body, which are connected with the winding ends in such way, that the winding ends are wrapped around the connection pins using a Wire-Wrap method. The connection pins extend vertically to the reed axis (3). The coil body is preferably formed in a single piece. An Independent claim is provided for a corresponding coil or transformer using the coil body.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem rohrartigen Spulenkörper (1) für eine Drossel oder einen Transformator zur Aufnahme mindestens einer Wicklung mit fest an dem Spulenkörper (1) angeordneten Anschlußstiften (2), die zum Verbinden mit den Wicklungsenden bestimmt sind, derart daß die Wicklungsenden um diese Anschlußstifte (2) mittels Wire-Wrap-Technik herumzuwickeln sind, erstrecken sich die Anschlußstifte (2) im wesentlichen senkrecht zur Rohrachse (3). Hierdurch kann der Spulenkörper einfacher und schneller bewickelt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 5/02 (2006.01); H01F 27/29 (2006.01); H01F 41/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/29 (2013.01); H01F 5/02 (2013.01); H01F 41/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913484 U1 20001207; EP 1075003 A2 20010207; EP 1075003 A3 20020327

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091104

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061229

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 27/30 A, 7H 01F 41/06 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI