Global Patent Index - EP 1075006 A1

EP 1075006 A1 2001-02-07 - Drive arrangement for a medium respectively high voltage switch and method for moving of a first contact

Title (en)

Drive arrangement for a medium respectively high voltage switch and method for moving of a first contact

Title (de)

Antriebsanordnung für einen Schalter der Mittel- bzw. Hochspannung und Verfahren zum Bewegen eines ersten Kontaktstueckes

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour un disjoncteur à moyenne respectivement haute tension et procédé pour déplacer un premier contact

Publication

EP 1075006 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250264 A

Priority

DE 19937074 A

Abstract (en)

A drive arrangement for a medium- or high-voltage switch, has a first contact piece (5) which is movable by means of a drive (1) having a variable path-time characteristic. The energy (10) supplied to the drive is influenced by a processing device in dependence of the current intensity of the current being switch and/or of the voltage applied to the switch. The processing device (2) is specifically a control device. A device for detecting the path covered by the first contact piece is used and the ascertained value is then supplied to the control device.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Antriebsanordnung der Mittel- bzw. Hochspannungstechnik wird mittels einer Verarbeitungseinrichtung (2) in Abhängigkeit von der Stromstärke des zu schaltenden Stromes und/oder der am Schalter anliegenden Spannung die einem Antrieb (1) zugeführte Energie (10) so beeinflußt, daß ein bewegbares Kontaktstück (5) mit einer veränderlichen Weg-Zeit-Charakteristik antreibbar ist. Diese Beeinflussung kann in Form einer Steuerung oder Regelung erfolgen. Bei einer Ausführung als Regelung wird der zurückgelegte Weg eines angetriebenen Kontaktstückes (5) als Regelgröße verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/26; H01H 33/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/28 (2006.01); H01H 3/22 (2006.01); H01H 33/04 (2006.01); H01H 33/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/28 (2013.01); H01H 3/222 (2013.01); H01H 33/04 (2013.01); H01H 33/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4141564 A1 19930624 - ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075006 A1 20010207; EP 1075006 B1 20020220; DE 19937074 C1 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-06-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050207

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040817

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-08-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG, INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CH-LC/IP

- Effective date: 20021119

2003-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000115 20020328

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI