Global Patent Index - EP 1075008 A2

EP 1075008 A2 2001-02-07 - Rocker switch

Title (en)

Rocker switch

Title (de)

Wippenschalter

Title (fr)

Commutateur à bascule

Publication

EP 1075008 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107677 A

Priority

DE 29913653 U

Abstract (en)

The wiper switch has a pivoted contact wiper (22) displaced in either direction from a central neutral position to bring a movable contact (28) into contact with a cooperating stationary contact (30), under control of a switch wiper (10). The pivot mounting (24) for the contact wiper has 2 U-shaped supports lying on either side of the contact wiper and a bearing block, with initial sideward movement of the contact wiper during the contact opening movement.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Wippenschalter, bei dem eine Kontaktwippe durch eine federbelastete Schalthülse einer Betätigungswippe verschwenkt wird, wirkt der Spitzenteil der Hülse mit vom Mittelabschnitt der Wippe nach oben vorstehenden Vorsprüngen oder Höckern derart zusammen, daß eine seitliche Verschiebung der Wippe bis zu einem Anschlag erfolgt, wodurch die sichere Kontaktgabestellung aufrechterhalten wird, bis in einer außermittigen Schnappstellung die Kontakte schlagartig und irreversibel geöffnet werden. Bei der Öffnungsschaltbewegung gleiten die Kontakte im Sinne einer Selbstreinigung aufeinander. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/20; H01H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/18 (2006.01); H01H 23/20 (2006.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/20 (2013.01); H01H 1/18 (2013.01); H01H 1/5833 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913653 U1 19991118; EP 1075008 A2 20010207; EP 1075008 A3 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 23/20 A, 7H 01H 1/18 B, 7H 01H 23/16 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI