Global Patent Index - EP 1075053 A2

EP 1075053 A2 2001-02-07 - Coaxial surge voltage arrester

Title (en)

Coaxial surge voltage arrester

Title (de)

Koaxialer Überspannungsableiter

Title (fr)

Dérivateur de surtension coaxial

Publication

EP 1075053 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115646 A

Priority

DE 19936869 A

Abstract (en)

The device consists of a section of coaxial cable with the inner conductor (10b) of a quarter wavelength short circuit line branched off from its inner conductor (10a), fed through the outer conductor (2) wall in insulated manner, arranged in a chamber formed in the outer conductor and electrically contacted by the outer conductor at its end. The section of the inner conductor (10b) of the quarter-wavelength short circuit line in the chamber (4) is at least approximately in a plane approximately parallel to the axis of the coaxial cable section.

Abstract (de)

Ein koaxialer Überspannungsableiter besteht aus einem Koaxialleitungsabschnitt, von dessen Innenleiter (1) der Innenleiter (10a) einer /4-Kurzschlußleitung radial abzweigt, isoliert durch die Wand (2) des Außenleiters hindurchgeführt ist und sich in einer in dem Außenleiter ausgebildeten Kammer (4) fortsetzt sowie an seinem Ende mit dem Außenleiter elektrisch kontaktiert ist. Eine konstruktiv einfache Ausführungsform zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß der in der Kammer (4) angeordnete Abschnitt (10b) des Innenleiters der Kurzschlußleitung wenigstens annähernd in einer zu der Achse des Koaxialleitungsabschnitts zumindest annähernd parallelen Ebene liegt, am besten etwa ringförmig um eine zu der diesen Abschnitt (10b) enthaltenden Ebene rechtwinkelige und zumindest näherungsweise die Achse des Koaxialleitungsabschnitts schneidende Achse (A-A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/48 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075053 A2 20010207; EP 1075053 A3 20020417; EP 1075053 B1 20041020; CN 1190867 C 20050223; CN 1284759 A 20010221; DE 19936869 C1 20010308; US 6529357 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130721

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008302

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008302

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008302 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR LI SE

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR LI SE

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR LI SE

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI