Global Patent Index - EP 1075055 A1

EP 1075055 A1 2001-02-07 - Current distribution device including a commanded mechanical locking of the plug in the corresponding socket

Title (en)

Current distribution device including a commanded mechanical locking of the plug in the corresponding socket

Title (de)

Stromverteilereinrichtung mit mechanischer Steuerverriegelung des Steckers in der entsprechenden Steckdose

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution de courant commandé à verrouillage mécanique de la fiche dans un socle correspondant

Publication

EP 1075055 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402040 A

Priority

FR 9909939 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism uses a cable to link the switch action to the plug and socket lock. The electrical outlet box comprises a single casing (12) housing the outlet socket (18) and a switch (20) connected to control the power supply to the socket. The plug (22) which is to be fitted into the socket includes a projecting rib (30) which is intended to fit into a corresponding slot (29) in the outlet socket. A locking mechanism is provided to engage this projecting rib, in order to secure the plug in the socket. A cable (39) is attached to the locking mechanism, with the second end of this cable being coupled to the rotary switch operating button (19), such that once the switch is turned on, the plug cannot be removed from the socket. The cable is fitted into a guide channel within the casing of the box.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de distribution de courant comportant un socle de prise de courant dont la mise sous tension est commandée par un interrupteur. Selon l'invention, le dispositif comporte un socle de prise de courant (18), et un interrupteur (20) actionné par un bouton de manoeuvre (19), le verrouillage de la fiche (22) dans le socle est assuré par un mécanisme comprenant un câble (39) s'étendant entre l'interrupteur et le socle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/707

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/707 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/707 (2013.01); Y10S 439/911 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075055 A1 20010207; EP 1075055 B1 20060301; BR 0003519 A 20010313; DE 60026263 D1 20060427; DE 60026263 T2 20061123; ES 2255955 T3 20060716; FR 2797720 A1 20010223; FR 2797720 B1 20011026; HU 0002999 A2 20010528; HU 0002999 A3 20030228; HU 0002999 D0 20000928; HU 222952 B1 20040128; PL 197954 B1 20080530; PL 341747 A1 20010212; US 6410868 B1 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2013-07-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130702

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110718

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110718

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60026263

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2255955

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-07-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LEGRAND FRANCE EN LEGRAND SNC

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LEGRAND FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60026263

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI