Global Patent Index - EP 1075056 A2

EP 1075056 A2 2001-02-07 - Integrated terminal board-filter safety assembly, in particular for electrical household appliances

Title (en)

Integrated terminal board-filter safety assembly, in particular for electrical household appliances

Title (de)

Klemmbrett mit integriertem Entstörfilter insbesondere für elektrische Haushaltgeräte

Title (fr)

Panneau de raccordement muni d'un filtre d'interférence en particulier pour appareils électroménagers

Publication

EP 1075056 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00116721 A

Priority

IT MI991759 A

Abstract (en)

A terminal board-filter assembly (1) defined by a cup-shaped box body (3) made of electrically insulating material and divided internally into two side by side cavities (4, 5), a first (4) housing the components (6) of an electronic filter (7) preferably preassembled on a printed circuit, and the second (5) housing a first number of electrical contacts (8) assembled and wired to one another and to the filter (7) and including at least one ground contact (48); the box body (3) is provided with a removable cover (15) on an open side of the box body (3) defining a common chamber (13) for access to the cavities (4, 5); a second number of electrical contacts (52), also wired to the components (6) of the filter (7), are provided on the outside of the box body (3), on a bottom wall (10) of the box body, at the first cavity (4) and on the opposite side to the cover (15), and are preferably housed inside a collar (40) formed in one piece with the bottom wall (10); and the bottom wall also has an opening (33) formed at the second cavity (5) and housing a plate portion (49) of the ground contact (48), which plate portion has at least one hole (50) for receiving a fastening member and is positioned parallel to and projecting slightly with respect to an outer surface (30) of the bottom wall (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/74 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 13/719 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/743 (2013.01); H01R 13/5816 (2013.01); H01R 13/719 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075056 A2 20010207; EP 1075056 A3 20010606; EP 1075056 B1 20030625; DE 60003498 D1 20030731; DE 60003498 T2 20040519; ES 2200762 T3 20040316; IT 1313149 B1 20020617; IT MI991759 A1 20010205; IT MI991759 D0 19990804

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200762

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60003498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITW INDUSTRIAL COMPONENTS S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/74 A, 7H 01R 9/24 B

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI