Global patent index - EP 1075058 A2

EP 1075058 A2 2001-02-07 - Clamping device for clamping metal terminals on electric cables and clamping press including said device

Title (en)

Clamping device for clamping metal terminals on electric cables and clamping press including said device

Title (de)

Klemmeinrichtung zum Klemmen von Anschlusskontakten auf elektrische Kabeln und Klemmpresse mit solcher Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de serrage pour le serrage de contacts métalliques sur câbles électriques et presse de serrage avec cet appareil

Publication

EP 1075058 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113768 A

Priority

IT MI991728 A

Abstract (en)

A device for clamping metal terminals on electric cables comprises an adjustable height bottom (3) provided with a wedge (11) housed and slidable between a top plate (17) for supporting the clamping device (2) and a bottom plate (16). This device allows to adjust the load of the knives on the metal terminal (9) and on the cable (10) thereby overcoming in a quick and simple manner any clamping defects, without interrupting the operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0488 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075058 A2 20010207; EP 1075058 A3 20020724; IT 1313283 B1 20020717; IT MI991728 A1 20010202; IT MI991728 D0 19990802

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061108

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050606

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI