Global Patent Index - EP 1075167 A2

EP 1075167 A2 2001-02-07 - Plasma spray device

Title (en)

Plasma spray device

Title (de)

Plasmaspritzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pulvérisation par plasma

Publication

EP 1075167 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810085 A

Priority

DE 19935468 A

Abstract (en)

The spray coating device has a burner head (1) provided with a discharge jet for the plasma beam (10), acting as an anode and supplied with the coating powder via a feed channel (9) which is radial to the longitudinal axis of the discharge jet. The burner head has at least one gas exit opening (12a) supplied with a gas for preventing deposition of particles of the spray coating material in the vicinity of the discharge jet.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Plasmaspritzvorrichtung vorgeschlagen, deren Brennerkopf (1) mit einem Anodenbasiskörper (2), einem Kathodenbasiskörper (4) und einem dazwischen eingefügten Isolierkörper (3) versehen ist. In den Anodenbasiskörper (2) ein Gaszufuhrkanal (12) eingelassen, der in eine im wesentlichen kegelförmig gestaltete Ausnehmung (13) mündet. Über diesen Gaszufuhrkanal (12) kann ein zwischen einem Pulverzufuhrkanal (9) und der Auslassdüse (6) verlaufender Hohlraum (15) mit einem Gas geflutet werden. Dadurch werden Ansammlungen von Beschichtungspulverpartikeln im Bereich der Auslassdüse (6) weitestgehend vermieden und die Qualität der augetragenen Schicht verbessert.. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/34 (2006.01); C23C 4/00 (2006.01); H05H 1/26 (2006.01); H05H 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075167 A2 20010207; EP 1075167 A3 20011212; CA 2303981 A1 20010128; DE 19935468 A1 20010215; JP 2001052893 A 20010223; KR 20010020643 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070810

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020112

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI