Global patent index - EP 1075229 A1

EP 1075229 A1 2001-02-14 - BAG FOR PACKAGING LIQUID SUBSTANCES FOR ANIMAL ARTIFICIAL INSEMINATION

Title (en)

BAG FOR PACKAGING LIQUID SUBSTANCES FOR ANIMAL ARTIFICIAL INSEMINATION

Title (de)

BEHÄLTNIS ZUM VERPACKEN VON FLÜSSICHEM MATERIAL FÜR DIE KÜNSTLICHE BESAHMUNG VON TIEREN

Title (fr)

SACHET DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE SUBSTANCES LIQUIDES POUR L'INSEMINATION ARTIFICIELLE ANIMALE

Publication

EP 1075229 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920882 A

Priority

  • FR 9901179 W
  • FR 9806393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778841A1] A bag (1) for packaging liquids for animal artificial insemination includes separate sealable portions for filling and for emptying the bag. The bag comprises two thermoplastic sheets bonded together with a join line forming a pouch and defining a closed rectangular space (3). Along one of the shorter sides, a sealable break (4) through which the bag is filled is located, and in the other shorter side there is a break through which the bag is emptied. This emptying arrangement (10) is preferably bell-shaped and is sealed by means of a peelable strip (12). Preferably the thermoplastic sheets are colored and bear identification of the species or genetic type of animal used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61D 19/00; A61J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/02 (2006.01); A61D 19/00 (2006.01); A61D 19/02 (2006.01); A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01); B65D 33/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/10 (2013.01); A61D 19/00 (2013.01); A61D 19/022 (2013.01); A61J 2205/20 (2013.01); A61J 2205/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959498A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CY DE FR GR IE IT LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778841 A1 19991126; FR 2778841 B1 20010831; AT 249792 T 20031015; AU 3829299 A 19991206; AU 749341 B2 20020627; BR 9906466 A 20000926; CA 2296713 A1 19991125; CA 2296713 C 20040330; CH 693813 A5 20040227; CN 1163195 C 20040825; CN 1272052 A 20001101; DE 1075229 T1 20010719; DE 69911396 D1 20031023; DE 69911396 T2 20040701; DK 177119 B1 20111031; DK 200000064 A 20000117; EP 1075229 A1 20010214; EP 1075229 B1 20030917; ES 1043836 U 20000116; ES 1043836 Y 20000701; ES 2167282 A1 20020501; ES 2167282 B1 20040301; FI 20000105 A 20000119; GB 0001137 D0 20000308; GB 2342912 A 20000426; GB 2342912 B 20020626; JP 2002515376 A 20020528; KR 100457097 B1 20041110; PL 338179 A1 20001009; SE 0000154 D0 20000119; SE 0000154 L 20000119; SE 522754 C2 20040302; TW 403645 B 20000901; WO 9959498 A1 19991125; ZA 200000219 B 20010103

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-11-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: JOERGEN KRUUSE A/S

2004-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JOERGEN KRUUSE A/S

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031226

2003-12-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69911396

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CY DE FR GR IE IT LU MC NL PT

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV RO SI

2003-09-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2001-07-19 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-06-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000118

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CY DE FR GR IE IT LU MC NL PT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000118;LT PAYMENT 20000118;LV PAYMENT 20000118;RO PAYMENT 20000118;SI PAYMENT 20000118