Global Patent Index - EP 1075257 A1

EP 1075257 A1 2001-02-14 - USE OF TRICLOSAN FOR THE TREATMENT OF HELICOBACTER PYLORI INFECTIONS

Title (en)

USE OF TRICLOSAN FOR THE TREATMENT OF HELICOBACTER PYLORI INFECTIONS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON TRICLOSAN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HELICOBACTER PYLORI INFEKTIONEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE TRICLOSAN POUR TRAITER DES INFECTIONS PAR HELICOBACTER PYLORI

Publication

EP 1075257 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919357 A

Priority

  • GB 9901188 W
  • GB 9809347 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2336999A] The use of triclosan for the preparation of a medicament for the treatment of gastrointestinal disorders associated with Helicobacter pylori infections, characterized in that the medicament is in oral unit dosage form, each unit dose comprising from 300 mg to 2000 mg of triclosan.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2336999 A 19991110; GB 9910316 D0 19990630; AU 3716299 A 19991123; AU 749509 B2 20020627; EP 1075257 A1 20010214; GB 9809347 D0 19980701; WO 9956738 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/055 A, 7A 61P 1/04 B

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/055 A, 7A 61P 1/04 B

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT