Global Patent Index - EP 1075269 A2

EP 1075269 A2 2001-02-14 - ANTI-DIARRHEAL AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME

Title (en)

ANTI-DIARRHEAL AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME

Title (de)

MITTEL GEGEN DIARRHÖE UND METHODE ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

ANTIDIARRHEIQUE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DUDIT PRODUIT

Publication

EP 1075269 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99921785 A

Priority

  • US 9910049 W
  • US 8476598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958133A2] A food product and method for treating and preventing diarrhea in a subject animal suffering from or susceptible to diarrhea. The method comprises administering an egg product to the subject animal wherein the egg product is obtained from a hyperimmunized avian.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 35/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/44 (2006.01); A61K 35/54 (2006.01); A61P 1/12 (2006.01); C07C 29/10 (2006.01); C07K 16/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/57 (2013.01); C07K 16/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958133A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958133 A2 19991118; WO 9958133 A3 20000106; AU 3890599 A 19991129; AU 772785 B2 20040506; CA 2331314 A1 19991118; CN 1308540 A 20010815; EP 1075269 A2 20010214; JP 2002514604 A 20020521; NZ 508133 A 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKION LIFE SCIENCES LLC

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKION LIFE SCIENCES

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT