Global patent index - EP 1075274 A2

EP 1075274 A2 2001-02-14 - IMMUNOMODULATORS FOR VACCINES

Title (en)

IMMUNOMODULATORS FOR VACCINES

Title (de)

IMMUNOMODULATOREN FÜR IMPSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

VACCIN

Publication

EP 1075274 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99922284 A

Priority

  • GB 9901461 W
  • GB 9809958 A
  • GB 9811954 A
  • GB 9812316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958145A2] There is disclosed the use of: (i) EtxB, CtxB or VtxB free from whole toxin; (ii) an agent other than EtxB or CtxB, having GM1-binding activity, or an agent other than VtxB having Gb3-binding activity; or (iii) an agent having an effect on intracellular signalling events mediated by GM1-binding or Gb3 binding; as an immunomodulator for a vaccine against infectious diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/12; A61K 38/16; A61K 39/245; A61K 39/385

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 39/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/245 (2006.01); A61K 39/385 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/245 (2013.01); A61K 38/164 (2013.01); A61K 39/12 (2013.01); A61K 39/385 (2013.01); A61K 39/39 (2013.01); A61K 2039/543 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55544 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); A61K 2039/6037 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16634 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958145A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958145 A2 19991118; WO 9958145 A3 20000203; AU 3939499 A 19991129; BR 9910305 A 20010109; CA 2331832 A1 19991118; CN 100335130 C 20070905; CN 1308546 A 20010815; CZ 20004147 A3 20010516; CZ 302333 B6 20110316; EA 004794 B1 20040826; EP 1075274 A2 20010214; GB 0027072 D0 20001220; GB 2353472 A 20010228; HU 0104842 A2 20020429; HU 0104842 A3 20021228; IL 139467 A 20111130; IL 139467 D0 20011125; IS 5694 A 20001031; JP 2002514607 A 20020521; JP 4666761 B2 20110406; KR 20070067719 A 20070628; MX PA00010934 A 20030714; NO 20005599 A 20010108; NO 20005599 D0 20001106; NZ 507911 A 20040430; PL 344519 A1 20011105

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20121201

2006-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HIRST, TIMOTHY, RAYMOND

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WILLIAMS, NEIL, ANDREW

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MORGAN, ANDREW

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WILSON, ANDREW DOUGLAS

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BIRD, LUCY AMBER

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BIRD, LUCY, AMBER

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030722

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001204;LT PAYMENT 20001204;LV PAYMENT 20001204;MK PAYMENT 20001204;RO PAYMENT 20001204;SI PAYMENT 20001204