Global Patent Index - EP 1075339 A1

EP 1075339 A1 2001-02-14 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING GRID MATS

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING GRID MATS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GITTERMATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR FABRIQUER DES MATS DE TREILLIS

Publication

EP 1075339 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00904674 A

Priority

  • AT 0000035 W
  • AT 35099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0051760A1] The invention relates to a method and installation for producing grid mats comprised of longitudinal and transversal rods (L, Q) which are welded to one another at crossing points. According to the invention, material billets made of hot-rolled material and serving to form the longitudinal and transversal rods are continuously drawn from each wire supply (1, 10), and in order to improve the mechanical-technological properties thereof, are stretched (27), subsequently temper rolled (30) and cut into lengths (3), whereupon the longitudinal rods (L) are introduced in a group by group manner into the grid welding machine (9) and are welded therein to transversal rods (Q). The material billets for forming the transversal rods (Q) are fed at a lower speed than that of the material billets for forming the longitudinal rods (L). The longitudinal and transversal rods are produced from material billets which run in a preferably parallel manner with regard to the direction (P1) of production, whereby all material billets used to form the transversal rods (Q) are turned around an angle of 90 DEG , and the number of material billets used to form the transversal (Q) rods is greater than that for the longitudinal rods (L).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/10; B21F 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/10 (2006.01); B21F 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/10 (2013.01); B21F 27/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0051760A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0051760 A1 20000908; AT 240173 T 20030515; AT 408196 B 20010925; AT A35099 A 20010215; DE 50002151 D1 20030618; EP 1075339 A1 20010214; EP 1075339 B1 20030514

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002151 P 20030618

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020508

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL