Global Patent Index - EP 1075350 A1

EP 1075350 A1 2001-02-14 - GUIDING CART FOR A MANUALLY GUIDED TOOL, ESPECIALLY AN ABRASIVE CUT-OFF MACHINE

Title (en)

GUIDING CART FOR A MANUALLY GUIDED TOOL, ESPECIALLY AN ABRASIVE CUT-OFF MACHINE

Title (de)

FÜHRUNGSWAGEN FÜR EIN VON HAND FÜHRBARES ARBEITSGERÄT, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN TRENNSCHLEIFER

Title (fr)

CHARIOT DE GUIDAGE POUR UN OUTIL GUIDE MANUELLEMENT, NOTAMMENT POUR UNE TRON ONNEUSE A MEULE

Publication

EP 1075350 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924883 A

Priority

  • DE 19820029 A
  • EP 9903084 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19820029A1] The invention relates to a guiding cart for a manually guided tool, for example an abrasive cut-off machine (12), which comprises a movable frame (1) on which a first and a second locating recess (7, 8) for inserting the abrasive cut-off machine (12) are provided. A locking device (9) is assigned to the first recess (7) by means of which forces can be applied to the abrasive cut-off machine (12) in the direction of the first locating recess (7) and the second locating recess (8). In this way the abrasive cut-off machine (12) can be reliably and rapidly fixed to the guiding cart after it has been inserted into the locating recesses (7, 8). The insertion of the abrasive cut-off machine (12) is facilitated by inclined inserting elements situated in the locating recesses (7, 8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 27/08; B23Q 9/00; B25H 1/00; B28D 1/04; E01C 23/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/09 (2006.01); B24B 19/02 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01); B24B 27/06 (2006.01); B24B 27/08 (2006.01); B28D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/02 (2013.01); B24B 27/0608 (2013.01); B24B 27/08 (2013.01); B28D 1/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956909A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19820029 A1 19991118; DE 19820029 C2 20000615; EP 1075350 A1 20010214; EP 1075350 B1 20020130; ES 2172331 T3 20020916; JP 2002513683 A 20020514; JP 4399114 B2 20100113; US 6478666 B1 20021112; WO 9956909 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150506

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59900805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130506

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120208

2003-04-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-11-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172331

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-14

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE