Global patent index - EP 1075356 A1

EP 1075356 A1 2001-02-14 - SHARPENABLE EDGE SHARPENING EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

SHARPENABLE EDGE SHARPENING EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

SCHÄRFVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHÄRFBARE KANTEN

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT D'AFFUTAGE D'ARETES SUSCEPTIBLES D'ETRE AFFUTEES

Publication

EP 1075356 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924554 A

Priority

  • ZA 9900031 W
  • ZA 9803774 A
  • ZA 9811222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956915A1] Sharpening equipment in the form of sharpening device (10) comprises jaw fashion arranged gripping means (12) for gripping an item such as a knife (50) of which the blade requires sharpening, a sharpening means carrier in the form of a sharpening element holding base (14) releasably holding a sharpening stone (16), a guiding layout in the form of a guiding rod (18) mounted to reciprocate along an adjustably mounted support guide (20) in parallel with the sharpening surface (16.1) and an angle adjustment facility as provided by a connecting arm (24). The arm (24) extends integrally with respect to the gripping means (12) and is swivellably connected to the leading end of the rod (18). A disc (26) as mounted about the swivelling position presents a graduated dial providing face (28). The gripping means (12) is arranged to cause its central axis (46) to pass through the pivotal point (48) between the gripping means (12) and the rod (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 15/06; B24D 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 15/06 (2006.01); B24D 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 15/06 (2013.01); B24D 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956915A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956915 A1 19991111; AT 273107 T 20040815; AU 4102999 A 19991123; CA 2331369 A1 19991111; DE 69919345 D1 20040916; DE 69919345 T2 20050908; EP 1075356 A1 20010214; EP 1075356 B1 20040811

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69919345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080505

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060505

2005-08-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020114

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT