Global Patent Index - EP 1075357 A2

EP 1075357 A2 2001-02-14 - HANDLE FOR A HAND TOOL, ESPECIALLY A SCREWDRIVER GRIP

Title (en)

HANDLE FOR A HAND TOOL, ESPECIALLY A SCREWDRIVER GRIP

Title (de)

GRIFF FÜR EIN HANDWERKZEUG, INSBESONDERE SCHRAUBENDREHERGRIFF

Title (fr)

POIGNEE POUR OUTIL A MAIN, EN PARTICULIER POIGNEE DE TOURNEVIS

Publication

EP 1075357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99931006 A

Priority

  • DE 9901327 W
  • DE 29807944 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2330945A1] Disclosed is a handle for a hand tool, especially a screwdriver grip, having an elongated body (2) for interchangeably clamping torque-transmitting tool bits. Essentially, at least two polygonal shanks (3, 4, 5) are provided as tool clamps on the body of the handle (2), in which the tool bits (10, 11, 1 2) can be inserted through their locating sleeves (13). The shanks are interspaced and oriented at an angle in relation to each other and to the longitudinal extension of the body of the handle (2) in such a way that the handle can be used as a screwdriver, a T or a revolver grip.

[origin: CA2330945A1] Disclosed is a handle for a hand tool, especially a screwdriver grip, having an elongated body (2) for interchangeably clamping torque-transmitting tool bits. Essentially, at least two polygonal shanks (3, 4, 5) are provided as tool clamps on the body of the handle (2), in which the tool bits (10, 11, 12) can be inserted through their locating sleeves (13). The shanks are interspaced and oriented at an angle in relation to each other and to the longitudinal extension of the body of the handle (2) in such a way that the handle can be used as a screwdriver, a T or a revolver grip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/46 (2006.01); B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25B 23/16 (2006.01); B25F 1/02 (2006.01); B25G 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/063 (2013.01); B25B 13/461 (2013.01); B25B 15/00 (2013.01); B25B 23/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956916A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807944 U1 19981008; AT 234175 T 20030315; AU 4768099 A 19991123; CA 2330945 A1 19991111; CA 2330945 C 20050920; CN 1126642 C 20031105; CN 1297392 A 20010530; DE 19980774 D2 20010412; EP 1075357 A2 20010214; EP 1075357 B1 20030312; ES 2194478 T3 20031116; JP 2002513686 A 20020514; JP 4620247 B2 20110126; US 6606925 B1 20030819; WO 9956916 A2 19991111; WO 9956916 A3 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140505

2016-01-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160129

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140504

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140504

2015-03-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904534

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140504

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904534

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GMEILBAUER ENGELBERT

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-05-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194478 T3

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030715

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030527

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904534 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 15/00 A, 7B 25G 1/00 B, 7B 25G 1/06 B

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE