Global Patent Index - EP 1075391 A1

EP 1075391 A1 2001-02-14 - ECONOMICAL PRINTING METHOD USING AN IMAGING TAPE AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

ECONOMICAL PRINTING METHOD USING AN IMAGING TAPE AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

BILLIGES VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKEN MIT EINEM DRUCKBAND UND DRUCKER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ECONOMIQUE D'IMPRESSION A L'AIDE D'UN RUBAN D'IMPRESSION ET DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1075391 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99916965 A

Priority

  • FR 9901033 W
  • FR 9805515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778143A1] The invention concerns a method for successively printing, by ink transfer, a plurality of images on at least one printed support (100) using an imaging tape (10), wherein, for printing each image, the tape (10) is driven simultaneously with the support (100) in front of a printing head (1) in a forward direction, and, between two successive image printing, the tape (10) is driven in reverse direction, along a travel path such that the next image is printed using at least one printing zone remaining from the previously used tape. When a plurality of supports are printed by offsetting by the interval of one predetermined space each support lower edge from the following support upper edge, the tape (10) is driven in reverse direction, between the support successive prints, along a travel path at least equal to said spacing interval. The invention is particularly applicable to fax machines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/06 (2006.01); B41J 17/12 (2006.01); B41J 33/14 (2006.01); B41J 33/52 (2006.01); B41J 33/54 (2006.01); B41J 35/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 35/16 (2013.01); B41J 17/12 (2013.01); B41J 33/14 (2013.01); B41J 33/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956961A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778143 A1 19991105; FR 2778143 B1 20000609; AU 3526499 A 19991123; DE 69901058 D1 20020425; DE 69901058 T2 20021031; EP 1075391 A1 20010214; EP 1075391 B1 20020320; JP 2002513700 A 20020514; WO 9956961 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090504

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090326 AND 20090401

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901058 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB