Global Patent Index - EP 1075392 A1

EP 1075392 A1 2001-02-14 - IMPROVED CONSUMABLE ITEM CARTRIDGE FOR PRINTER

Title (en)

IMPROVED CONSUMABLE ITEM CARTRIDGE FOR PRINTER

Title (de)

PERFEKTIONIERTE VERBRAUCHSGUTKASSETTE FÜR DRUCKER

Title (fr)

CARTOUCHE PERFECTIONNEE DE PRODUIT CONSOMMABLE POUR IMPRIMANTE

Publication

EP 1075392 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99916964 A

Priority

  • FR 9901032 W
  • FR 9805517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778142A1] The invention concerns a consumable item (6) cartridge (1) for a printer, comprising a chip card (3, 4) storing data concerning the consumable technical characteristics and print control (14). The electronic chip (4) is designed to be read by a logic to a microprocessor (14) and is carried by a removable card (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 17/36; B41J 35/36; G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 17/36 (2006.01); B41J 35/36 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17546 (2013.01); B41J 17/36 (2013.01); B41J 35/36 (2013.01); G03G 15/0855 (2013.01); G03G 15/0863 (2013.01); G03G 15/0865 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956962A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778142 A1 19991105; FR 2778142 B1 20000609; DE 69901059 D1 20020425; DE 69901059 T2 20021128; EP 1075392 A1 20010214; EP 1075392 B1 20020320; US 6522348 B1 20030218; WO 9956962 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69901059

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS S. A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69901059

- Effective date: 20130129

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69901059

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69901059

- Representative's name: ,

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69901059

2009-04-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090326 AND 20090401

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901059 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB