Global Patent Index - EP 1075408 A1

EP 1075408 A1 2001-02-14 - BOGIE FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (en)

BOGIE FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (de)

DREHGESTELL FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

BOGIE POUR VEHICULES SUR RAILS

Publication

EP 1075408 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922127 A

Priority

  • DE 19819467 A
  • EP 9902797 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819467A1] The invention relates to a bogie (1) for rail vehicles. Two interconnected wheel bearing housings wherein wheel axles (5) for rail wheels (2) are mounted are articulated by an oscillating link (10) on said bogie. The rail wheels (2) are driven by means of laterally situated gears (11) which are accommodated in gear housings. According to the invention, the gear housings (4) form one unit with their allocated wheel bearing housings, for the wheel axles and the oscillating link (10). This simplifies the articulation of the rail wheels (2) on the bogie (1) and reduces the variety of parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/32; B61C 9/50; B61F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/50 (2006.01); B61F 3/16 (2006.01); B61F 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/16 (2013.01); B61C 9/50 (2013.01); B61F 5/325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956996A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819467 A1 19991111; AT 219736 T 20020715; EP 1075408 A1 20010214; EP 1075408 B1 20020626; JP 2002513712 A 20020514; US 6363861 B1 20020402; WO 9956996 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901860

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 219736 T

- Effective date: 20140426

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090426

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090426

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901860 20020801

2002-07-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219736 T 20020715

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT