Global Patent Index - EP 1075431 A1

EP 1075431 A1 2001-02-14 - TRANSPARENT OR TRANSLUCENT PAPER ENVELOPE

Title (en)

TRANSPARENT OR TRANSLUCENT PAPER ENVELOPE

Title (de)

DURCHSICHTIGE ODER TRANSLUZENTE HÜLLE AUS PAPIER

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE EN PAPIER TRANSPARENT OU TRANSLUCIDE

Publication

EP 1075431 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99913354 A

Priority

  • FR 9900745 W
  • FR 9804345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950149A1] The invention concerns a transparent paper product such as translucent drawing paper or paper made transparent. Said product comprises at least two transparent or translucent surfaces (2, 3) made integral with each other by means of an adhesive or glue film. The invention is characterised in that the adhesive or glue film has a predetermined shape and is visible by transparency or transmittance. Preferably it comprises a front surface (3), a back surface (2), the back surface (2) comprising two flaps (4, 5) and a bottom flap made integral with the flaps (4, 5) by means of a glue film with a predetermined shape and visible by transparency or transmittance. The invention is useful as an envelope.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950149A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950149 A1 19991007; DE 69941693 D1 20100107; EP 1075431 A1 20010214; EP 1075431 B1 20091125; FR 2790736 A1 20000915; FR 2790736 B1 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091125

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100330

2010-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100308

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-03-31 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-01-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69941693 P 20100107

2009-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2009-11-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THIBIERGE ET COMAR

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THIBIERGE, EMERIC

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOEILLOT, JEAN-FRANCOIS

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI NL