Global Patent Index - EP 1075445 A1

EP 1075445 A1 2001-02-14 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FURTHER CONVEYANCE OF FLAT OBJECTS ARRIVING IN A LAMELLAR FLOW

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FURTHER CONVEYANCE OF FLAT OBJECTS ARRIVING IN A LAMELLAR FLOW

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WEITERFÖRDERN VON IN EINEM SCHUPPENSTROM ANFALLENDEN FLÄCHIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR POURSUIVRE L'ACHEMINEMENT D'OBJETS PLATS ARRIVANT DANS UN COURANT LAMELLAIRE

Publication

EP 1075445 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99902493 A

Priority

  • CH 9900072 W
  • CH 95298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955609A1] In each case at least two objects arriving in a lamellar flow (14) are grasped from the side by a conveyor clamp (22) and conveyed further while maintaining their mutual position. The at least two objects forming a section are held by a single conveyor clamp in a clamping area (30) where the objects (14) overlap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 29/005 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4354 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44712 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955609A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955609 A1 19991104; AT 226917 T 20021115; AU 2262299 A 19991116; AU 752572 B2 20020926; AU 752572 C 20030724; BR 9910033 A 20001226; CA 2327521 A1 19991104; DE 59903255 D1 20021205; DK 1075445 T3 20021125; EP 1075445 A1 20010214; EP 1075445 B1 20021030; ES 2182479 T3 20030301; HU 0101398 A2 20010928; HU 0101398 A3 20020228; HU 222551 B1 20030828; JP 2002512930 A 20020508; NO 20005458 A 20001129; NO 20005458 D0 20001027; PL 343768 A1 20010910; PT 1075445 E 20030331; RU 2200693 C2 20030320; US 6736391 B1 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090216

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060217

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060217

2006-02-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-02-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060216

2005-03-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2005-02-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182479 T3

2003-02-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903255 20021205

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-11-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226917 T 20021115

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE