Global Patent Index - EP 1075487 A4

EP 1075487 A4 2002-11-20 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND FÜR DIESE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT

Publication

EP 1075487 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99922717 A

Priority

  • US 9908504 W
  • US 8290498 P
  • US 8899498 P
  • US 8927898 P
  • US 9164798 P
  • US 9763998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955721A1] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 38/00; C07K 14/435; C12N 1/20; C12P 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9748801 A2 19971224 - GENETICS INST [US]
  • [PX] WO 9906551 A2 19990211 - GENSET SA [FR], et al
  • [XD] DATABASE EMBL [online] 18 April 1997 (1997-04-18), "EST179381 HCC cell line (metastasis to liver in mouse) II Homo sapiens DNA", XP002213862, Database accession no. AA308563
  • [A] CLAROS MANUEL G ET AL: "Prediction of N-terminal protein sorting signals.", CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, vol. 7, no. 3, 1997, pages 394 - 398, XP002213563, ISSN: 0959-440X
  • See also references of WO 9955721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955721 A1 19991104; AU 3965299 A 19991116; CA 2327551 A1 19991104; EP 1075487 A1 20010214; EP 1075487 A4 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-11-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE