Global Patent Index - EP 1075506 A1

EP 1075506 A1 2001-02-14 - BLEACHING AND DISINFECTING AGENTS

Title (en)

BLEACHING AND DISINFECTING AGENTS

Title (de)

BLEICH- UND DESINFEKTIONSMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENTS DE BLANCHIMENT ET DE DESINFECTION

Publication

EP 1075506 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923494 A

Priority

  • EP 9902903 W
  • US 8476798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958635A1] The invention relates to new bleaching and disinfecting agents which contain, in relation to the agents, (a) between 1 and 6 weight % alkali metal hypochlorites, (b) between 0.5 and 5 weight % alkylether sulfates and/or amino oxides, (c) between 0.5 and 2 weight % alkali metal hydroxides, (d) between 0.5 and 3 weight % electrolyte salts, (e) between 0.01 and 1 weight % tetrahydromyrcenol, and (f) between 0 and 4 weight % fatty acid salts, provided that the above quantities are completed to 100 weight % by the addition of water and possibly other aids and additives. These preparations have a sufficiently high viscosity as well as a very good storage stability, dispersing power for colour pigments and stability in chlorine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/395; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 3/3956 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958635A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958635 A1 19991118; AT 297978 T 20050715; CN 1299405 A 20010613; DE 59912187 D1 20050721; EP 1075506 A1 20010214; EP 1075506 B1 20050615; ES 2244196 T3 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-05-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER NV

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-05-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20060314

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060429

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244196 T3

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912187 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL