Global Patent Index - EP 1075531 A1

EP 1075531 A1 2001-02-14 - GENOMIC SEQUENCES UPSTREAM OF THE CODING REGION OF THE IFN-ALPHA2 GENE FOR PROTEIN PRODUCTION AND DELIVERY

Title (en)

GENOMIC SEQUENCES UPSTREAM OF THE CODING REGION OF THE IFN-ALPHA2 GENE FOR PROTEIN PRODUCTION AND DELIVERY

Title (de)

GENOMISCHE SEQUENZEN, DIE STROMAUFWÄRTS DER IFN-ALPHA2 KODIERENDEGEBIET LIEGEN: FÜR PROTEIN PRODUKTION UND VERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES GENOMIQUES EN AMONT DE LA REGION CODANTE DU GENE IFN-ALPHA2 DESTINEES A LA PRODUCTION ET A L'ADMINISTRATION DE PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1075531 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920375 A

Priority

  • US 9909925 W
  • US 8464898 P
  • US 8655598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9957292A1] An isolated nucleic acid molecule that hybridizes under stringent conditions, or shares at least 80 % sequence identity, with a defined genomic region upstream of the coding region of the IFNA2 gene, and a DNA construct containing that DNA molecule as a targeting sequence for homologous recombination.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/67; C12N 15/90; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/21; C07K 14/56; A61K 48/00; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/56 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/67 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/56 (2013.01); C12N 15/67 (2013.01); C12N 15/85 (2013.01); C12N 15/907 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2840/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9957292 A1 19991111; WO 9957292 A9 19991216; AR 016264 A1 20010620; AU 3788899 A 19991123; CA 2328459 A1 19991111; CN 1309710 A 20010822; CZ 20003705 A3 20010411; CZ 299418 B6 20080716; EP 1075531 A1 20010214; HU 0102517 A2 20011128; HU 0102517 A3 20040628; IL 139433 D0 20011125; JP 2002513580 A 20020514; NO 20005585 A 20010105; NO 20005585 D0 20001106; PL 344517 A1 20011105; TR 200003271 T2 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034745

2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040518

2001-04-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE