Global patent index - EP 1075555 A1

EP 1075555 A1 2001-02-14 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COVERED YARN

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COVERED YARN

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON UMWINDEGARN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER DU FIL GUIPE

Publication

EP 1075555 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00903658 A

Priority

  • DE 19903797 A
  • DE 19924883 A
  • EP 0000755 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6571546B1] In a device for manufacturing covered yarn in which one or several threads (6) surround a yarn core in a helical fashion a rotating winding spindle is provided with a spool (5). The winding thread (6) is located on the spool (5). The winding spindle is surrounded by a stationary pot (8, 8a, 8b) that can be divided along a geneatrix, in particular in the axial direction of the pot (8, 8a, 8b). The parts of the pot (8, 8a, 8b) comprise a layer (30, 30a, 30b) that surrounds the spool (5) at least partially and is mechanically and/or thermally wear-resistant and/or exhibits low friction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/42 (2006.01); D02G 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/427 (2013.01); D02G 3/385 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0046437A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6571546 B1 20030603; AU 2546000 A 20000825; EP 1075555 A1 20010214; EP 1075555 B1 20031217; WO 0046437 A2 20000810; WO 0046437 A3 20001214

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004771

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE