Global Patent Index - EP 1075556 A1

EP 1075556 A1 2001-02-14 - METHOD OF RECYCLING SELVAGE WARP YARNS AND APPARATUS TO CARRY OUT THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD OF RECYCLING SELVAGE WARP YARNS AND APPARATUS TO CARRY OUT THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWENDUNG VON KANTENKETTFÄDEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECYCLAGE DE FILS DE CHAINE POUR LISIERE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1075556 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920205 A

Priority

US 9809067 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9957352A1] A method of recycling selvage warp yarns (14) in a weaving operation involves providing selvage warp yarns (14) which are continuous. The selvage is slit after passing through the loom (18) from the main fabric warp yarns (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957352A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9957352 A1 19991111; AU 7283098 A 19991123; DE 69809298 D1 20021212; DE 69809298 T2 20030911; EP 1075556 A1 20010214; EP 1075556 B1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809298

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB