Global Patent Index - EP 1075564 A1

EP 1075564 A1 2001-02-14 - EXTENDED-NIP PRESS ROLL AND A PRESS SECTION OF A PAPER MACHINE APPLYING IT

Title (en)

EXTENDED-NIP PRESS ROLL AND A PRESS SECTION OF A PAPER MACHINE APPLYING IT

Title (de)

PRESSWALZE FÜR EINE LANGSPALTPRESSE UND SEINER ANWENDUNG IN EINER PRESSENPARTIE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU DE PRESSE A PINCE ALLONGEE ET SECTION PRESSE DE MACHINE A PAPIER L'UTILISANT

Publication

EP 1075564 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906273 A

Priority

  • FI 9900146 W
  • FI 980491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945195A1] The invention relates to an extended-nip press roll (10) for a paper machine, comprising a stationary central axle (15), a loading shoe (11), and hydraulic loading elements (12) situated between the stationary axle (15) and the loading shoe (11), by means of which elements an active frontal face (18) of the loading shoe (11) is pressed against an inner face fo a flexible hose mantle (16) of the extended-nip press roll (10) in order to produce a compression pressure in an extended-nip zone (EN; EN1;EN2) formed by said extended-nip press roll with its backup roll (20). The loading shoe (11) and its loading and oil-drain arrangements are substantially symmetrical in relation to the axial centre plane (K-K) of the extended-nip press roll (10) so that the direction of rotation of the hose mantle (16) may be either direction and as required by the position of the extended-nip press roll (10). In addition, press section geometries applying these extended-nip press rolls (10) are presented.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945195 A1 19990910; AT 239130 T 20030515; DE 69907440 D1 20030605; DE 69907440 T2 20040318; EP 1075564 A1 20010214; EP 1075564 B1 20030502; FI 111860 B 20030930; FI 980491 A0 19980304; FI 980491 A 19990905

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907440

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE