Global Patent Index - EP 1075566 A1

EP 1075566 A1 2001-02-14 - PAPER MACHINE, PAPER MACHINE BELT FOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TEXTURED SOFT PAPER

Title (en)

PAPER MACHINE, PAPER MACHINE BELT FOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TEXTURED SOFT PAPER

Title (de)

PAPIERMASCHINE, PAPIERMASCHINENBESPANNUNG FÜR , UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEMUSTERTEM WEICHEN PAPIER

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PAPIER, BANDE POUR MACHINE A PAPIER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER DOUX TEXTURE

Publication

EP 1075566 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963730 A

Priority

  • SE 9802371 W
  • SE 9800949 A
  • US 99228597 A
  • US 21164798 A
  • US 21279898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931318A1] A paper machine for manufacturing textured soft paper comprises a press section with a press nip, through which an impermeable belt and a felt run with the fibrous web between them, a drying cylinder and a transfer roll forming a nip for transfer of the web to the drying cylinder. According to the invention the belt is a texturing belt having a back layer and a web-contacting layer having depressions with surface portions situated between them to form a relief pattern in the web upon passage through the press nip, the texturing belt running from the press to the drying cylinder in order to carry the textured web to the transfer nip. The felt runs away from the texturing belt before a water film formed in the press nip on the texturing belt breaks up. A device is provided before the transfer nip to apply adhesive on the drying cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00; D21F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931318A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931318 A1 19990624; AT 385271 T 20080215; BR 9813780 A 20001003; CA 2314113 A1 19990624; CA 2314113 C 20070717; DE 69839081 D1 20080320; EP 1075566 A1 20010214; EP 1075566 B1 20080130; JP 2002508460 A 20020319; JP 3495704 B2 20040209

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SUNDSVALL, SE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: VALMET AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-03-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839081

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-06-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130509 AND 20130515

2013-05-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Effective date: 20130404

2009-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080130

2008-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69839081 P 20080320

2008-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2008-01-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060626

2006-06-21 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000620

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLERELID, INGVAR, B., E.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINDEN, ANDERS, T.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AMPULSKI, ROBERT, S.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OSTENDORF, WARD, W.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POLAT, OSMAN

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000620

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE