Global patent index - EP 1075573 A1

EP 1075573 A1 2001-02-14 - A DEVICE AT A LOG BUILDING CORNER

Title (en)

A DEVICE AT A LOG BUILDING CORNER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG AN EINER ECKE EINES BLOCKHAUSES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF RELATIF AU COIN EN BOIS D'UN BATIMENT

Publication

EP 1075573 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902952 A

Priority

  • SE 9900056 W
  • SE 9801512 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958778A1] A device for improving the insulation at log joined buildings, and particularly the insulation against draught between surfaces of recesses (7, 7', 7'') in logs (1, 2, 3), which in the joint cooperatingly engage each other, whereby the device incorporates further recesses (6, 6', 6''), provided in the surfaces perpendicular to the said recesses (7, 7', 7''), whereby in these recesses (6, 6', 6''; 7, 7', 7'') are provided slots (10 and 9, resp.), which are positioned substantially perpendicular to each other, thus that the slots (9, 10) in two logs positioned in criss cross relation to each other, will be situated aligned with each other and located just in front of each other, and that the device furthermore incorporates substantially U-shaped insulation elements (11, 11a), each being arranged to be inserted with its base portion and its shanks (13) in the slots (9) in one of the recesses in one of the logs, and to protrude out of these slots (9), and to project with its protruding portions into the slots (10) of the adjacent log, thus that it together with said slots forms a labyrinth seal, which is movably arranged in relation to each slot (9, 10) and thereby to adjacent recesses in the logs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/10; E04B 2/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/10 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01); E04B 2/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958778A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FI FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958778 A1 19991118; AT 237042 T 20030415; AU 2304499 A 19991129; DE 69906720 D1 20030515; DE 69906720 T2 20040129; DK 1075573 T3 20030721; EP 1075573 A1 20010214; EP 1075573 B1 20030409; ES 2197609 T3 20040101; JP 2002514698 A 20020521; NO 20005404 A 20001026; NO 20005404 D0 20001026; NO 310982 B1 20010924; SE 510016 C2 19990412; SE 9801512 D0 19980429; SE 9801512 L 19990412

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-09-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060119

2007-01-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060118

2005-02-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2197609

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FI FR

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FI FR