Global Patent Index - EP 1075578 A1

EP 1075578 A1 2001-02-14 - HOUSING PART WITH AN ACTUATING ELEMENT

Title (en)

HOUSING PART WITH AN ACTUATING ELEMENT

Title (de)

GEHÄUSETEIL MIT EINEM BETÄTIGUNGSORGAN

Title (fr)

PARTIE DE BOITIER POURVUE D'UN ORGANE D'ACTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1075578 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927702 A

Priority

  • DE 9901205 W
  • DE 19818920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915969A1] The actuating mechanism is arranged on a rigid support member. The actuating mechanism and support member are prefabricated as half components which are extruded along at least part of the side with the plastic of the casing. The support member is facing the electric switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; H01H 9/02; H01H 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H01H 13/06 (2006.01); H01H 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2013.01); G07C 9/00944 (2013.01); H01H 9/0214 (2013.01); H01H 9/0235 (2013.01); H01H 13/08 (2013.01); H01H 2009/048 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955990A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915969 A1 19991104; EP 1075578 A1 20010214; EP 1075578 B1 20040107; US 6462291 B1 20021008; WO 9955990 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-04-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040418

2004-04-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908257 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021028

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE