Global Patent Index - EP 1075587 A1

EP 1075587 A1 2001-02-14 - DEVICE FOR A ROCK WALL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR A ROCK WALL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FELSWAND

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR MUR DE ROCHE

Publication

EP 1075587 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99947044 A

Priority

  • SE 9900626 W
  • SE 9801476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956001A1] Device for sealing a rock wall, which device comprises an injection tube (3) adapted to be introduced into a bore hole (30) in the rock wall, into which bore hole filling material (31) is intended to be injected through the injection tube (3). The device also comprises a non-return valve (4) for the filling material, and may be permanently connected to a reinforcement bar (1) in order for the device to achieve both sealing and reinforcement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 20/00; E21D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 20/00 (2006.01); E21D 20/02 (2006.01); E21D 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 21/0046 (2013.01); E21D 20/028 (2013.01); E21D 21/0053 (2016.01); E21D 21/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956001A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956001 A1 19991104; AT 252682 T 20031115; AU 4298799 A 19991116; AU 746551 B2 20020502; CA 2330044 A1 19991104; CA 2330044 C 20080122; DE 69912267 D1 20031127; DE 69912267 T2 20040826; DK 1075587 T3 20040209; EP 1075587 A1 20010214; EP 1075587 B1 20031022; ES 2209508 T3 20040616; JP 2002533590 A 20021008; JP 4504563 B2 20100714; NO 20005456 A 20001227; NO 20005456 D0 20001027; NO 315135 B1 20030714; NO 315135 B3 20030714; PT 1075587 E 20040331; SE 510418 C2 19990525; SE 9801476 D0 19980427; SE 9801476 L 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160415

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130421

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150710

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140420

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 252682

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140420

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130420

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69912267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131021

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-01-14 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20030405255

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20131104

2013-12-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-10-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: GMA GROUND MACHINERY APPLICATIONS AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: HC

- Ref Document Number: 252682

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120807

2012-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GMA GROUND MACHINERY APPLICATIONS AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69912267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-07-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69912267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BECKER, KURIG, STRAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-06-26 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: GMA GROUND MACHINERY APPLICATIONS AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-06-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: GMA GROUND MACHINERY APPLICATIONS AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20120427

2012-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GMA GROUND MACHINERY APPLICATIONS AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-07-29 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2011-06-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GMA GROUND MACHINERY APPLICATIONS AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69912267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-03-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: GURLITA GMA AKTIEBOLAG;BOX 21;68621 SUNNE (SE)

2008-05-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-02-21 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GURLITA GMA AKTIEBOLAG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20080213

2006-03-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GURLITA GMA AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209508

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-02-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030405255

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69912267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IT LI PT

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021230

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IT LI PT