Global Patent Index - EP 1075597 A1

EP 1075597 A1 2001-02-14 - MOUNTING/DEMOUNTING DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND/OR DEMOUNTING A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

MOUNTING/DEMOUNTING DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND/OR DEMOUNTING A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

MONTAGE/DEMONTAGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE UND/ODER DEMONTAGE EINES BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTILS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE ET/OU DEMONTAGE D'UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1075597 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99973748 A

Priority

  • DE 9903142 W
  • DE 19908573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19908573A1] The invention relates to a mounting/demounting device (1) for mounting and demounting a fuel injection valve (22) in or out of a receiving bore (21) of a cylinder head (20) of an internal combustion engine. Said mounting/demounting device (1) has a jacket (2) consisting of a tubular section (4) and a contact section (3) which is applied to the fuel injection valve (22) with a radially inwardly projecting bearing surface (7). Said contact section (3), which can be formed by at least two elastic contact sections (3a, 3b) that are separated from each other by recesses (11, 12), can be displaced between an engaging position in which a nonpositive connection with the fuel injection valve (22) can be established and a releasing position in which the mounting/demounting device (1) can be removed from the fuel injection valve (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14; B25B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/0035 (2013.01); F02M 61/14 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53843 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53878 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53943 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53952 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052327A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19908573 A1 20000831; EP 1075597 A1 20010214; EP 1075597 B1 20040929; JP 2002538370 A 20021112; US 6363596 B1 20020402; WO 0052327 A1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910668

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040929

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910668 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030827

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI