Global Patent Index - EP 1075623 A1

EP 1075623 A1 2001-02-14 - PORTABLE ELECTRIC TORCH WITH DUAL LIGHTING AND ADJUSTABLE FOCUS

Title (en)

PORTABLE ELECTRIC TORCH WITH DUAL LIGHTING AND ADJUSTABLE FOCUS

Title (de)

TRAGBARE, ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE MIT ZWEI LICHTQUELLEN UND MIT EINSTELLBARER BRENNWEITE

Title (fr)

LAMPE ELECTRIQUE PORTATIVE A DOUBLE ECLAIRAGE ET A REGLAGE DE LA FOCALISATION

Publication

EP 1075623 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00909423 A

Priority

  • DE 19909220 A
  • FR 0000542 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909220A1] A portable electric torch with dual lighting, provided with a cover (16) containing the following: a first bulb (12) that is associated with a first reflector (28), and a rotationally moveable actuating ring (34) that controls the lighting circuit for said bulb (12) and adjusts the focus by means of relative translatory movement of the bulb (12) and the reflector (28). The lighting circuit consists of a first sectioning interval (146) that can be opened or closed to turn the first bulb (12) on or off, in addition to a second sectioning interval (147) for the power supply to a second bulb (14) when the actuating ring (34) is in a predetermined angle position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/02; F21V 14/06; F21L 4/02; F21L 4/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 14/02 (2006.01); F21L 4/02 (2006.01); F21L 4/04 (2006.01); F21L 14/00 (2006.01); F21L 14/02 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/06 (2006.01); F21V 15/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01); F21V 29/15 (2015.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/0414 (2013.01); F21L 14/00 (2013.01); F21L 14/023 (2013.01); F21V 14/045 (2013.01); F21V 15/02 (2013.01); F21V 29/15 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2101/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2113/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909220 A1 20000907; AU 3171600 A 20000921; DE 60033473 D1 20070405; DE 60033473 T2 20071108; EP 1075623 A1 20010214; EP 1075623 B1 20070221; JP 2002538589 A 20021112; US 6481869 B1 20021119; WO 0052384 A1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070516

2007-06-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-05-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070521

2007-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60033473

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-04-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

2007-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 14/02 20060101AFI20060825BHEP

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 14/06 20060101ALI20060825BHEP

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21L 4/02 20060101ALI20060825BHEP

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21L 4/04 20060101ALI20060825BHEP

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI