Global Patent Index - EP 1075669 A1

EP 1075669 A1 2001-02-14 - DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING AN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE OR OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE CABLE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING AN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE OR OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE CABLE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM UMLENKEN EINES LICHTWELLENLEITERS ODER EINES LICHTWELLENLEITERKABELS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DEVIER UN GUIDE D'ONDES OPTIQUES OU UN CABLE A FIBRES OPTIQUES

Publication

EP 1075669 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907453 A

Priority

  • DE 0000383 W
  • DE 19906206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906206A1] The two funnel-shaped bodies are flared like the mouth of a trumpet and each mouth is split into two halves, (a,c;b,d). There is a central mounting plate (3), holding tubular clamps (5,6) and there is a central space (4) through which the optical fiber cables (8,9) pass. The radius of curvature of the funnel-shaped bodies is equal to or less than the minimum allowable radius of curvature of the cables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/4471 (2013.01); G02B 6/4452 (2013.01); G02B 6/4454 (2013.01); G02B 6/4459 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049443A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906206 A1 20000817; EP 1075669 A1 20010214; WO 0049443 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERICSSON AB

2008-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071228

2007-03-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERICSSON AB

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI SE