Global patent index - EP 1075690 A1

EP 1075690 A1 2001-02-14 - TAPE SERVO PATTERN INCLUDING LONGITUDINAL POSITION INFORMATION

Title (en)

TAPE SERVO PATTERN INCLUDING LONGITUDINAL POSITION INFORMATION

Title (de)

BANDSERVOMUSTER DAS LONGITUDINALE POSITIONSINFORMATION ENTHÄHLT

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE POUR POSITIONNEUR A BANDE MAGNETIQUE COMPRENANT DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A SON POSITIONNEMENT LONGITUDINAL

Publication

EP 1075690 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913305 A

Priority

US 9806261 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 5/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/09 (2006.01); G11B 5/008 (2006.01); G11B 5/584 (2006.01); G11B 15/087 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075690 A1 20010214; EP 1075690 A4 20020612; JP 2002515622 A 20020528; JP 4022373 B2 20071219

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090328

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050624

2002-06-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 11B 5/008 A, 7G 11B 15/087 B, 7G 11B 5/584 B

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMATION CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT