Global Patent Index - EP 1075691 A1

EP 1075691 A1 2001-02-14 - TAPE SERVO PATTERN WITH TRACK IDENTIFICATION

Title (en)

TAPE SERVO PATTERN WITH TRACK IDENTIFICATION

Title (de)

BANDSERVOMUSTER MIT SPURIDENTIFIKATION

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE POSITIONNEUR A BANDE MAGNETIQUE AVEC IDENTIFICATION DE PISTE

Publication

EP 1075691 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914352 A

Priority

US 9806262 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 5/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/09 (2006.01); G11B 5/584 (2006.01); G11B 5/55 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/584 (2013.01); G11B 5/5504 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075691 A1 20010214; EP 1075691 A4 20060614; JP 2002510111 A 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060503

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMATION CORP.

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE