Global Patent Index - EP 1075701 A2

EP 1075701 A2 2001-02-14 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THE CONTROL OF ELECTRIC HEATING ELEMENTS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THE CONTROL OF ELECTRIC HEATING ELEMENTS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH DER STEUERUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN HEIZUNGSELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A LA COMMANDE D'ELEMENTS CHAUFFANTS ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1075701 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99918131 A

Priority

  • GB 9901219 W
  • GB 9808484 A
  • GB 9815894 A
  • GB 9903652 A
  • GB 9904908 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954903A2] An inlet connector for a cordless electrical water heating appliance is of a kind adapted to be mated with a complementary base connector throughout 360 DEG of relative rotational orientation between the appliance and its base and is adapted to be secured centrally to the underside of the heating element of the appliance, preferably a thick film heating element. Two heating element overtemperature controls are integrated with the inlet connector by being received in pockets formed around the circumferential periphery of a moulded plastics body part of the inlet connector. In one emobiment each control consists of a bimetal supported in a spring metal carrier which has an integral part formed into a bistable, overcentre switch-operating mechanism. In another embodiment one control comprises a fusible component. Resetting of the or each bimetallic control is effected in response to lifting the applicance off its base and then reseating it on the base. The fusible component control holds the fusible component under spring tension so that when it melts in response to an overtemperature condition, the spring is released and causes rapid opening of a set of switch contacts. A steam sensor can be coupled directy to the connector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/04; H01H 37/00; H01R 13/713

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/00 (2006.01); H01H 37/04 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01); H01R 13/713 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/043 (2013.01); H01H 37/002 (2013.01); H01H 37/54 (2013.01); H01R 13/7137 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954903A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954903 A2 19991028; WO 9954903 A3 19991202; AU 3617099 A 19991108; CN 1139089 C 20040218; CN 1292446 C 20061227; CN 1305635 A 20010725; CN 1495820 A 20040512; DE 69902456 D1 20020912; DE 69902456 T2 20030424; EP 1075701 A2 20010214; EP 1075701 B1 20020807; GB 2339088 A 20000112; GB 2339088 B 20020724; GB 9909171 D0 19990616

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902456

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902456 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2002-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL