Global Patent Index - EP 1075774 A1

EP 1075774 A1 2001-02-14 - SELECTIVE UTILIZATION OF SERVICES IN A MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM

Title (en)

SELECTIVE UTILIZATION OF SERVICES IN A MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE SYSTEM

Title (de)

SELEKTIVE NUTZUNG VON DIENSTEN IN EINEM MOBILFUNKSYSTEM

Title (fr)

UTILISATION SELECTIVE DE SERVICES DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE MOBILE

Publication

EP 1075774 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919102 A

Priority

  • DE 9900793 W
  • DE 19819212 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956490A1] The invention is based on the idea of automatically blocking the power characteristics or services which cannot be supported interference-free by the mobile radiotelephone system when the radio equipment is momentarily engaged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38; H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 8/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956490A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956490 A1 19991104; CN 1298618 A 20010606; EP 1075774 A1 20010214; JP 2002513260 A 20020508; JP 4283996 B2 20090624; US 6549777 B1 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080729

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT