Global patent index - EP 1075790 A9

EP 1075790 A9 2001-04-04 - CUT-FLOWER FRESHNESS RETENTIVE

Title (en)

CUT-FLOWER FRESHNESS RETENTIVE

Title (de)

FRISCHHALTEMITTEL FÜR SCHNITTBLUMEN

Title (fr)

AGENT DE CONSERVATION DE FRAICHEUR POUR FLEURS COUPEES

Publication

EP 1075790 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 98953017 A

Priority

  • JP 9805081 W
  • JP 13436698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955153A1] An excellent cut-flower freshness retentive containing 0.8-2 wt.% of at least one sugar, 100-1,000 ppm of at least one potassium salt in terms of K2O, and 1-30 ppm of at least one compound selected from among aluminum and zinc salts and hydrates thereof in terms of Al or Zn.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 3/02; A01N 59/00; A01N 59/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955153 A1 19991104; EP 1075790 A1 20010214; EP 1075790 A9 20010404; EP 1075790 B1 20040218

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-20 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20140814

2014-07-18 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140613

2014-07-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: OAT AGRIO CO., LTD., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140613

2014-05-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OAT AGRIO CO., LTD., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-04-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OTSUKA AGRITECHNO CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO AG

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WERNER BRUDERER PATENTANWALT

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI NL

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-07-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI NL