Global patent index - EP 1075805 A2

EP 1075805 A2 2001-02-14 - Belt pack

Title (en)

Belt pack

Title (de)

Gürteltasche

Title (fr)

Boîtier porté à la ceinture

Publication

EP 1075805 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116756 A

Priority

DE 29914028 U

Abstract (en)

Belt pocket for an electronic key card (20) containing a transmitter comprises a flat pocket housing (11) and at least one belt loop.

Abstract (de)

Die Gürteltasche weist ein flaches Taschengehäuse 11 auf, das zur Aufnahme einer einen Sender enthaltenden elektronischen Schlüsselkarte 20 bestimmt ist. An der Vorderwand 12 des Taschengehäuses 11 ist ein Fenster 15 vorgesehen, durch das die Schlüsselkarte 20 sichtbar ist. Durch die Vorderwand bzw. das Fenster kann auch eine Taste 21 der Schlüsselkarte betätigt werden und es können Signalleuchten 22,23 eingesehen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/00; A45F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/18 (2006.01); A45C 11/32 (2006.01); A45F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/32 (2013.01); A45C 11/182 (2013.01); A45F 5/02 (2013.01); A45F 5/021 (2013.01); A45F 2200/055 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914028 U1 19991118; EP 1075805 A2 20010214; EP 1075805 A3 20020403

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB LI

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 45F 3/00 A, 7A 45F 5/02 B, 7A 45C 11/32 B, 7A 45C 11/18 B

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI