Global patent index - EP 1075808 A1

EP 1075808 A1 2001-02-14 - Spindle support for a turntable in corner cupboards

Title (en)

Spindle support for a turntable in corner cupboards

Title (de)

Drehachslagerung für einen Drehboden in Eckschränken

Title (fr)

Support d'axe pour un plateau tournant dans des placards de coin

Publication

EP 1075808 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115890 A

Priority

EP 99115890 A

Abstract (en)

The bearing system for the revolving floor of a corner cupboard, especially a 7/8 floor, comprises a vertical axle (2) which fits into a V-opening (1a) in a hub (3) which is shaped like a part of a circle. An insert (4) on the opposite side to the hub has a clamping segment (6) which cooperates with slots on a wedge (5) to lock it in place at different heights.

Abstract (de)

Die Drehachslagerung für einen Drehboden (1), insbesondere 7/8-Drehboden, nimmt den Drehboden (1) mit einer vertikalen Achse (2) in einem Eckschrank drehbar auf und dabei umfaßt der Drehboden (1) mit einer teilkreisförmigen Nabe (3) seiner V-Öffnung (1a) die Achse (2) teilweise. Der Drehboden (1) nimmt in seiner V-Öffnung (1a) einen der Nabe (3) gegenüberliegenden Einsatz (4) auf; in diesem Einsatz (4) ist ein an der Achse (2) anliegender Keil (5) höhenverschiebbar geführt und in dem Einsatz (4) lagert ein auf den Keil (5) einwirkendes Klemmsegment (6) mit Handhebel (7) drehbar. Der Drehboden (1) mit Einsatz (4) ist an der Achse (2) durch den Keil (5) und das Klemmsegment (6) stabil, drehfest und kippgesichert lagefixierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 49/00; A47B 57/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01); A47B 57/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/26 (2013.01); A47B 49/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075808 A1 20010214; EP 1075808 B1 20040414; DE 59909184 D1 20040519

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909184

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909184

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030206

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI