Global Patent Index - EP 1075828 A2

EP 1075828 A2 2001-02-14 - Variable chair for cosmetic purposes or for massaging

Title (en)

Variable chair for cosmetic purposes or for massaging

Title (de)

Variabler Kosmetik- und/oder Massagestuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil variable de cosmétique ou de massage

Publication

EP 1075828 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116235 A

Priority

DE 19938033 A

Abstract (en)

The variable cosmetic and/or massage chair has a somewhat flat reclining surface, at least one seating surface, a backrest (4), a leg surface and a movable arm rest that can be moved into a chair shape. One surface of the backrest can be extended and fixed in a defined extended position. The extension of the backrest can be performed with an auxiliary element. An Independent claim is also included for an auxiliary element for a variable cosmetic and/or massage chair.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Kosmetik- und/oder Massagestuhl (1) mit einer in etwa ebenen Liegefläche, der zumindest eine Sitzfläche (3), eine Rückenlehne (4), eine Beinfläche (5) und eine bewegbare Armlehne (6) hat, die in eine Stuhlform bewegbar sind. Eine Fläche (26) der Rückenlehne (4) ist erweiterbar. Vorzugsweise wird eine Erweiterung der Fläche (26) der Rückenlehne (4) mittels eines Zusatzelementes (9) ermöglicht, das auch als Nachrüstung an einem bestehenden Kosmetik- und/oder Massagestuhl (1) anordbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 15/00; A47C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/06 (2006.01); A61G 15/00 (2006.01); A61G 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/06 (2013.01); A61G 15/007 (2013.01); A61G 15/125 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075828 A2 20010214; EP 1075828 A3 20020410; DE 19938033 A1 20010308; DE 19938033 C2 20030410

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI