Global Patent Index - EP 1075846 A9

EP 1075846 A9 2001-04-25 - CUFF FOR BLOOD PRESSURE MANOMETER

Title (en)

CUFF FOR BLOOD PRESSURE MANOMETER

Title (de)

MANSCHETTE FÜR EIN BLUTDRUCKMESSGERÄT

Title (fr)

BRASSARD POUR TENSIOMETRE

Publication

EP 1075846 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 99917156 A

Priority

  • JP 9902208 W
  • JP 11692898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955400A1] A cuff (10) comprising a pressing air bag (11) for pressing the arteries (4, 5) of the wrist (1) by a preset volume of air supplied to the bag, a pushing air bag (12) for pushing the air bag (11) to the wrist (1) and a belt (13) for mounting the bags (11, 12) to the wrist (1), wherein, when measuring a blood pressure, a preset volume of air is supplied to the air bag (11) and then air is supplied to the air bag (12), the expanded air bag (12) allowing the air bag (11) to press the arteries (4, 5), whereby a higher-accuracy measurement is possible without uncomfortable feelings such as oppression and sweatiness and by the positive stopping of an arterial flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/022 (2006.01); A61B 5/0225 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/02233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955400 A1 19991104; WO 9955400 A8 19991229; WO 9955400 B1 20000203; EP 1075846 A2 20010214; EP 1075846 A4 20040818; EP 1075846 A9 20010425; JP H11309119 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20090128

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041119

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMRON HEALTHCARE CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-08-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61M 5/00 A

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/022 B

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMRON HEALTHCARE CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMRON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMRON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ITONAGA, KAZUNOBU OMRON CORPORATION

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KATO, HIROYUKI OMRON CORPORATION

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANAKA, TAKAHIDE OMRON CORPORATION

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMRON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMRON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT