Global Patent Index - EP 1075857 A1

EP 1075857 A1 2001-02-14 - Training apparatus

Title (en)

Training apparatus

Title (de)

Trainingsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'entraînement

Publication

EP 1075857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113490 A

Priority

DE 19938094 A

Abstract (en)

The exercise machine has a base frame (2), foot-rests (18) and handles(32) by which the force-resistance mechanism is operated. The seat (10) is mounted on a parallelogram guide and has one bearing arm which has a transmission part in the form of a frame (26) connected to the handles, thereby connecting the movements of the seat and handles. The transmission frame is connected to a crank drive (22) in the form f an eccentric wheel operated against braking force.

Abstract (de)

Der Sitz (10) eines Trainingsgerät ist über Parallelogrammarme (6a,6b) mit einem Grundrahmen (2) verbunden, so daß er kreissegmentförmige Bewegungen gegenüber dem Grundrahmen (2) ausführen kann. An einem Parallelogrammarm ist ein Trainingskraft-Übertragungsrahmen (26) angelenkt, welcher mit einem Ende an einem Kurbeltrieb (22) gelagert ist, der auf eine Riemenscheibe (24) arbeitet, die über einen Riemen (34) mit einem Schwungrad (38) verbunden ist. An diesem greift eine Bremse (40) an, gegen welche der Trainierende arbeitet. Vom Übertragungsrahmen (26) ragt vor dem Sitz (10) ein Griffhalter (30) mit Handgriffen (32) nach oben, am Grundrahmen (2) sind ferner Fußstützen (18) vorgesehen. Die Relativbewegungen zwischen Sitz (10), Übertragungsrahmen (26), der eine kombinierte Längs- und Schwenkbewegung ausführt, und Grundrahmen (2) erlauben eine Kraftausübung vom Sitz (10) über die Handgriffe (32) auf den Übertragungsrahmen (26), wobei Arme und Oberkörper trainiert werden. Eine Bewegung des Übertragungsrahmens (26) durch Beinbewegungen unter Zuhilfenahme der Fußstützen (18) erlaubt das Trainieren der Bein- und Bauchmuskulatur. Eine Lehne (12) mit einer Wirbelsäulenstütze (14) hält den Trainierenden in einer orthopädisch günstigen Position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 22/00; A63B 21/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/068 (2006.01); A63B 21/00 (2006.01); A63B 21/22 (2006.01); A63B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/0076 (2013.01); A63B 21/068 (2013.01); A63B 21/154 (2013.01); A63B 21/22 (2013.01); A63B 2022/0084 (2013.01); A63B 2208/0233 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075857 A1 20010214; EP 1075857 B1 20041027; DE 19938094 A1 20010222; DE 19938094 C2 20010628; ES 2228356 T3 20050416; US 6482133 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111007

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100626

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2008-02-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2228356 T3

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT NL

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI