Global Patent Index - EP 1075861 A2

EP 1075861 A2 2001-02-14 - Field boundary sensor system for a ball game

Title (en)

Field boundary sensor system for a ball game

Title (de)

Feldbegrenzungs-Erkennungssystem für eine Feld-Ballsportart

Title (fr)

Capteur de frontière de terrain pour jeu de balle

Publication

EP 1075861 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117469 A

Priority

DE 19938406 A

Abstract (en)

At least part of the court's demarcation-line (11) and or an adjacent part outside the court has a sensor (12) which reacts in pressure and or an impulse and consists of a strip. The sensor strip has at least two spaced apart electrically conducting layers (13,14). The sensitivity of the sensor is adjustable and has an audible or visual indicator (15) the duration, intensity and or color of which are adjustable.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein System für eine Feld-Ballsportart, insbesondere Squash, zum Bestimmen, ob Bälle außerhalb einer Feldbegrenzung auftreffen, wobei mindestens ein Teil einer Feldbegrenzungslinie und/oder ein an eine Feldbegrenzungslinie angrenzender, außerhalb des Spielfeldes liegender Teilbereich eine Sensorvorrichtung aufweisen. Die Erfindung bezieht sich ferner auf ein entsprechendes Verfahren, bei dem das Auftreffen eines Balls auf einer Feldbegrenzungslinie und/oder in einem an die Feldbegrenzungslinie angrenzenden, außerhalb des Spielfeldes liegenden Bereich mittels eines Sensors registriert wird, der Sensor ein Signal erzeugt und das Signal eine Anzeige steuert <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 63/00; A63B 71/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/0605 (2013.01); A63B 2071/0611 (2013.01); A63B 2102/06 (2015.10)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075861 A2 20010214; EP 1075861 A3 20011004; DE 19938406 A1 20010308; DE 19938406 C2 20020425

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040415

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI