Global Patent Index - EP 1075862 A1

EP 1075862 A1 2001-02-14 - A team game set and anthropomorphic piece

Title (en)

A team game set and anthropomorphic piece

Title (de)

Mannschaftspielsatz und anthropomorphes Stück

Title (fr)

Ensemble de jeu d'équipe et pièce anthropomorphe

Publication

EP 1075862 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830525 A

Priority

EP 99830525 A

Abstract (en)

A team game set includes a playing surface (1) which defines a field having two half-fields (1a, 1b) each associated with a team, subdivided by a network of lines (11, 13) into squares (15), each of which corresponds to a playing position, a pair of target structures (19) suitable for being arranged in proximity to the field base lines (3), a plurality of anthropomorphic pieces (20, 20a) having an extended base (29) that can be placed in a playing position (15) and a cover part (30) similar to a shirt and intended to receive a coloration to distinguish the players of the two teams, and a movable game member (21). A piece (20, 20a) and/or the movable game member (21) can be moved on the field at each playing turn according to a sequence of moves, for the purpose of bringing the movable game member (21) within one of the target structures (19). The elements of the set are produced from a sheet material, such as cardboard or the like. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/00 (2006.01); A63F 3/02 (2006.01); A63F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/00041 (2013.01); A63F 9/0415 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00719 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00835 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075862 A1 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010730;LT PAYMENT 20010730;LV PAYMENT 20010730;MK PAYMENT 20010730;RO PAYMENT 20010730;SI PAYMENT 20010730

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI